NY A11062 | 2017-2018 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on June 1 2018 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-06-20 - substituted by s8910a
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on June 1 2018 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-06-20 - substituted by s8910a
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Permits an assessing unit within the town of Neversink, county of Sullivan, to file their tentative assessment roll for 2018 no later than June 30, 2018.
Title
Permits an assessing unit within the town of Neversink, county of Sullivan, to file their tentative assessment roll for 2018 no later than June 30, 2018.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-06-19 - Assembly - Assembly Ways And Means Committee: Favorable refer to committee Rules (Y: 30 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2018-06-19 - Assembly - Assembly Rules Committee: Favorable (Y: 30 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2018-06-18 - Assembly - Assembly Real Property Taxation Committee: Favorable refer to committee Ways and Means (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-06-19 - Assembly - Assembly Rules Committee: Favorable (Y: 30 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2018-06-18 - Assembly - Assembly Real Property Taxation Committee: Favorable refer to committee Ways and Means (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-06-20 | Assembly | substituted by s8910a |
2018-06-19 | Assembly | ordered to third reading rules cal.427 |
2018-06-19 | Assembly | rules report cal.427 |
2018-06-19 | Assembly | reported |
2018-06-19 | Assembly | reported referred to rules |
2018-06-18 | Assembly | reported referred to ways and means |
2018-06-13 | Assembly | print number 11062a |
2018-06-13 | Assembly | amend and recommit to real property taxation |
2018-06-01 | Assembly | referred to real property taxation |
Same As/Similar To
S08910 (Same As) 2018-07-01 - SIGNED CHAP.111