NY A11061 | 2017-2018 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Introduced on June 1 2018 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-06-20 - substituted by s8882a
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on June 1 2018 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-06-20 - substituted by s8882a
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Authorizes a person holding the office of assistant district attorney in the county of Oswego to reside in an adjoining county within the state.
Title
Authorizes a person holding the office of assistant district attorney in the county of Oswego to reside in an adjoining county within the state.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-06-19 - Assembly - Assembly Rules Committee: Favorable (Y: 30 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2018-06-11 - Assembly - Assembly Codes Committee: Favorable refer to committee Rules (Y: 20 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2018-06-06 - Assembly - Assembly Governmental Operations Committee: Favorable refer to committee Codes (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-06-11 - Assembly - Assembly Codes Committee: Favorable refer to committee Rules (Y: 20 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2018-06-06 - Assembly - Assembly Governmental Operations Committee: Favorable refer to committee Codes (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-06-20 | Assembly | substituted by s8882a |
2018-06-19 | Assembly | ordered to third reading rules cal.394 |
2018-06-19 | Assembly | rules report cal.394 |
2018-06-19 | Assembly | reported |
2018-06-11 | Assembly | reported referred to rules |
2018-06-06 | Assembly | reported referred to codes |
2018-06-05 | Assembly | print number 11061a |
2018-06-05 | Assembly | amend and recommit to governmental operations |
2018-06-01 | Assembly | referred to governmental operations |
Same As/Similar To
S08882 (Same As) 2018-07-31 - SIGNED CHAP.185