NY A11040 | 2017-2018 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on June 11 2018 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-06-20 - RECOMMITTED TO RULES
Pending: Senate Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on June 11 2018 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-06-20 - RECOMMITTED TO RULES
Pending: Senate Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Relates to commercial fishing licenses extending the time period such licenses may be issued and setting limits on the number of licenses to be issued.
Title
Relates to commercial fishing licenses extending the time period such licenses may be issued and setting limits on the number of licenses to be issued.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-06-11 - Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 138 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2018-06-06 - Assembly - Assembly Rules Committee: Favorable (Y: 28 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2018-06-05 - Assembly - Assembly Environmental Conservation Committee: Favorable refer to committee Rules (Y: 29 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2018-06-06 - Assembly - Assembly Rules Committee: Favorable (Y: 28 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2018-06-05 - Assembly - Assembly Environmental Conservation Committee: Favorable refer to committee Rules (Y: 29 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-06-20 | Senate | RECOMMITTED TO RULES |
2018-06-20 | Senate | SUBSTITUTION RECONSIDERED |
2018-06-20 | Senate | 3RD READING CAL.2112 |
2018-06-20 | Senate | SUBSTITUTED FOR S7997A |
2018-06-11 | Senate | REFERRED TO RULES |
2018-06-11 | Assembly | delivered to senate |
2018-06-11 | Assembly | passed assembly |
2018-06-07 | Assembly | ordered to third reading rules cal.82 |
2018-06-07 | Assembly | rules report cal.82 |
2018-06-06 | Assembly | reported |
2018-06-05 | Assembly | reported referred to rules |
2018-05-31 | Assembly | referred to environmental conservation |
Same As/Similar To
S07997 (Same As) 2018-06-20 - SUBSTITUTED BY A11040