NY A11022 | 2017-2018 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on May 31 2018 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-06-18 - substituted by s8639c
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on May 31 2018 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-06-18 - substituted by s8639c
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Relates to standardized test administration; increases penalty for violations to one thousand dollars.
Title
Relates to standardized test administration; increases penalty for violations to one thousand dollars.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-06-13 - Assembly - Assembly Rules Committee: Favorable (Y: 29 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2018-06-11 - Assembly - Assembly Codes Committee: Favorable refer to committee Rules (Y: 20 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2018-06-06 - Assembly - Assembly Education Committee: Favorable refer to committee Codes (Y: 28 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2018-06-11 - Assembly - Assembly Codes Committee: Favorable refer to committee Rules (Y: 20 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2018-06-06 - Assembly - Assembly Education Committee: Favorable refer to committee Codes (Y: 28 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-06-18 | Assembly | substituted by s8639c |
2018-06-13 | Assembly | ordered to third reading rules cal.204 |
2018-06-13 | Assembly | rules report cal.204 |
2018-06-13 | Assembly | reported |
2018-06-11 | Assembly | reported referred to rules |
2018-06-07 | Assembly | print number 11022a |
2018-06-07 | Assembly | amend and recommit to codes |
2018-06-06 | Assembly | reported referred to codes |
2018-05-31 | Assembly | referred to education |
Same As/Similar To
S08639 (Same As) 2018-11-05 - SIGNED CHAP.351