NY A10696 | 2017-2018 | General Assembly

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on May 10 2018 - 25% progression
Action: 2018-06-18 - substituted by s8497
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Relates to amending the contribution provisions applicable to certain special plans to allow using any excess basic or additional member contributions to offset any deficits in such other contribution account prior to the date of retirement.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relates to amending the contribution provisions applicable to certain special plans to allow using any excess basic or additional member contributions to offset any deficits in such other contribution account prior to the date of retirement.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2018-06-13 - Assembly - Assembly Rules Committee: Favorable (Y: 29 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2018-06-11 - Assembly - Assembly Ways And Means Committee: Favorable refer to committee Rules (Y: 31 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2018-06-05 - Assembly - Assembly Governmental Employees Committee: Favorable refer to committee Ways and Means (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2018-06-18Assemblysubstituted by s8497
2018-06-13Assemblyordered to third reading rules cal.191
2018-06-13Assemblyrules report cal.191
2018-06-13Assemblyreported
2018-06-11Assemblyreported referred to rules
2018-06-05Assemblyreported referred to ways and means
2018-05-10Assemblyreferred to governmental employees

Same As/Similar To

S08497 (Same As) 2018-06-18 - returned to senate

New York State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback