NY A10685 | 2011-2012 | General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on July 18 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-07-18 - signed chap.182
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on July 18 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-07-18 - signed chap.182
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Authorizes the assessor of the county of Nassau to accept from Family Life Worship Center Inc., an application for exemption from real property taxes.
Title
Authorizes the assessor of the county of Nassau to accept from Family Life Worship Center Inc., an application for exemption from real property taxes.
Sponsors
Asm. Edward Ra [R] |
Roll Calls
2012-06-21 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 57 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 130 N: 7 NV: 0 Abs: 13) [PASS]
Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 130 N: 7 NV: 0 Abs: 13) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-07-18 | Senate | signed chap.182 |
2012-07-06 | Assembly | delivered to governor |
2012-06-21 | Senate | RETURNED TO ASSEMBLY |
2012-06-21 | Senate | PASSED SENATE |
2012-06-21 | Senate | 3RD READING CAL.1346 |
2012-06-21 | Senate | SUBSTITUTED FOR S7706A |
2012-06-21 | Senate | REFERRED TO RULES |
2012-06-21 | Assembly | delivered to senate |
2012-06-21 | Assembly | passed assembly |
2012-06-20 | Assembly | ordered to third reading rules cal.503 |
2012-06-20 | Assembly | rules report cal.503 |
2012-06-20 | Assembly | reported |
2012-06-20 | Assembly | reported referred to rules |
2012-06-19 | Assembly | reported referred to ways and means |
2012-06-18 | Assembly | print number 10685a |
2012-06-18 | Assembly | amend (t) and recommit to real property taxation |
2012-06-14 | Assembly | referred to real property taxation |
Same As/Similar To
S07706 (Same As) 2012-06-21 - SUBSTITUTED BY A10685A