NY A10620 | 2011-2012 | General Assembly

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Passed on August 17 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-08-17 - signed chap.401
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Provides for the amount of tax abatement for solar generating systems in cities of one million or more.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Provides for the amount of tax abatement for solar generating systems in cities of one million or more.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2012-06-21 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 60 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 143 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2012-08-17Senatesigned chap.401
2012-08-06Assemblydelivered to governor
2012-06-21SenateRETURNED TO ASSEMBLY
2012-06-21SenatePASSED SENATE
2012-06-21Senate3RD READING CAL.1519
2012-06-21SenateSUBSTITUTED FOR S7711
2012-06-19SenateREFERRED TO RULES
2012-06-19Assemblydelivered to senate
2012-06-19Assemblypassed assembly
2012-06-18Assemblyordered to third reading rules cal.372
2012-06-18Assemblyrules report cal.372
2012-06-18Assemblyreported
2012-06-18Assemblyreported referred to rules
2012-06-08Assemblyreferred to ways and means

Same As/Similar To

S07711 (Same As) 2012-06-21 - SUBSTITUTED BY A10620

New York State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback