NY A10573 | 2011-2012 | General Assembly

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-1)
Status: Passed on October 3 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-10-03 - signed chap.472
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Increases the base pilotage tariffs at Sandy Hook, Sands Point and Execution Rocks.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Increases the base pilotage tariffs at Sandy Hook, Sands Point and Execution Rocks.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2012-06-20 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 60 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 140 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 9) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2012-10-03Senatesigned chap.472
2012-09-21Assemblydelivered to governor
2012-06-20SenateRETURNED TO ASSEMBLY
2012-06-20SenatePASSED SENATE
2012-06-20SenateREFERRED TO RULES
2012-06-20Senate3RD READING CAL.1443
2012-06-20SenateSUBSTITUTED FOR S7467
2012-06-20SenateREFERRED TO RULES
2012-06-20Assemblydelivered to senate
2012-06-20Assemblypassed assembly
2012-06-20Assemblyordered to third reading rules cal.523
2012-06-20Assemblyrules report cal.523
2012-06-20Assemblyreported
2012-06-20Assemblyreported referred to rules
2012-06-20Assemblyreported referred to ways and means
2012-06-06Assemblyreferred to transportation

Same As/Similar To

S07467 (Same As) 2012-06-20 - SUBSTITUTED BY A10573

New York State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback