NY A10566 | 2011-2012 | General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on July 18 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-07-18 - signed chap.179
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on July 18 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-07-18 - signed chap.179
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Authorizes the Shiloh Baptist Church of New Rochelle to apply for a real property tax exemption for certain property located in the city of New Rochelle, county of Westchester.
Title
Authorizes the Shiloh Baptist Church of New Rochelle to apply for a real property tax exemption for certain property located in the city of New Rochelle, county of Westchester.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2012-06-19 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 56 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 139 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]
Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 139 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-07-18 | Senate | signed chap.179 |
2012-07-06 | Assembly | delivered to governor |
2012-06-19 | Senate | RETURNED TO ASSEMBLY |
2012-06-19 | Senate | PASSED SENATE |
2012-06-19 | Senate | 3RD READING CAL.1340 |
2012-06-19 | Senate | SUBSTITUTED FOR S7601 |
2012-06-18 | Senate | REFERRED TO RULES |
2012-06-18 | Assembly | delivered to senate |
2012-06-18 | Assembly | passed assembly |
2012-06-14 | Assembly | ordered to third reading rules cal.273 |
2012-06-14 | Assembly | rules report cal.273 |
2012-06-14 | Assembly | reported |
2012-06-13 | Assembly | reported referred to rules |
2012-06-12 | Assembly | reported referred to ways and means |
2012-06-06 | Assembly | referred to real property taxation |
Same As/Similar To
S07601 (Same As) 2012-06-19 - SUBSTITUTED BY A10566