NY A10516 | 2023-2024 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on May 30 2024 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-06-07 - substituted by s9772
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on May 30 2024 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-06-07 - substituted by s9772
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Authorizes Richard Lee Johnson to take the competitive civil service examination for the position of police officer and be placed on the eligible list for employment as a full-time police officer for the village of Canastota police department.
Title
Authorizes Richard Lee Johnson to take the competitive civil service examination for the position of police officer and be placed on the eligible list for employment as a full-time police officer for the village of Canastota police department.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2024-06-07 - Assembly - Assembly Rules Committee: Favorable (Y: 27 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2024-06-06 - Assembly - Assembly Ways And Means Committee: Favorable refer to committee Rules (Y: 35 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-06-06 - Assembly - Assembly Ways And Means Committee: Favorable refer to committee Rules (Y: 35 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-06-07 | Assembly | substituted by s9772 |
2024-06-07 | Assembly | rules report cal.659 |
2024-06-07 | Assembly | reported |
2024-06-06 | Assembly | reported referred to rules |
2024-06-05 | Assembly | reference changed to ways and means |
2024-05-31 | Assembly | print number 10516a |
2024-05-31 | Assembly | amend (t) and recommit to governmental employees |
2024-05-30 | Assembly | referred to governmental employees |
Same As/Similar To
S09772 (Same As) 2024-08-14 - SIGNED CHAP.225