NY A10446 | 2019-2020 | General Assembly

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 9-0)
Status: Introduced on May 18 2020 - 25% progression
Action: 2020-05-27 - substituted by s8415
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]

Summary

Relates to the crime of loitering.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relates to the crime of loitering.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2020-05-27 - Assembly - Assembly Rules Committee: Favorable (Y: 29 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2020-05-26 - Assembly - Assembly Codes Committee: Favorable refer to committee Rules (Y: 21 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2020-05-27Assemblysubstituted by s8415
2020-05-27Assemblyrules report cal.41
2020-05-27Assemblyreported
2020-05-26Assemblyreported referred to rules
2020-05-22Assemblyprint number 10446a
2020-05-22Assemblyamend (t) and recommit to codes
2020-05-18Assemblyreferred to codes

Same As/Similar To

S08415 (Same As) 2020-05-27 - returned to senate

New York State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback