NY A10399 | 2023-2024 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on May 21 2024 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-06-04 - substituted by s9241
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on May 21 2024 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-06-04 - substituted by s9241
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Provides that the inspector shall at least annually inspect any vessel operated on privately or publicly owned underground non-navigable waterways with no navigable inlet or outlet that carry passengers for compensation; makes technical corrections; makes related provisions.
Title
Provides that the inspector shall at least annually inspect any vessel operated on privately or publicly owned underground non-navigable waterways with no navigable inlet or outlet that carry passengers for compensation; makes technical corrections; makes related provisions.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2024-06-03 - Assembly - Assembly Rules Committee: Favorable (Y: 28 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2024-05-30 - Assembly - Assembly Ways And Means Committee: Favorable refer to committee Rules (Y: 33 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2024-05-28 - Assembly - Assembly Codes Committee: Favorable refer to committee Ways and Means (Y: 21 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2024-05-21 - Assembly - Assembly Tourism, Arts And Sports Development Committee: Favorable refer to committee Codes (Y: 21 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-05-30 - Assembly - Assembly Ways And Means Committee: Favorable refer to committee Rules (Y: 33 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2024-05-28 - Assembly - Assembly Codes Committee: Favorable refer to committee Ways and Means (Y: 21 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2024-05-21 - Assembly - Assembly Tourism, Arts And Sports Development Committee: Favorable refer to committee Codes (Y: 21 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-06-04 | Assembly | substituted by s9241 |
2024-06-03 | Assembly | ordered to third reading rules cal.382 |
2024-06-03 | Assembly | rules report cal.382 |
2024-06-03 | Assembly | reported |
2024-05-30 | Assembly | reported referred to rules |
2024-05-28 | Assembly | reported referred to ways and means |
2024-05-21 | Assembly | reported referred to codes |
2024-05-21 | Assembly | referred to tourism, parks, arts and sports development |
Same As/Similar To
S09241 (Same As) 2024-06-14 - SIGNED CHAP.119