NY A10389 | 2015-2016 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Introduced on May 25 2016 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-06-15 - substituted by s7910a
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on May 25 2016 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-06-15 - substituted by s7910a
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Authorizes the Chabad Lubavitch Chai Center, Inc. to receive retroactive real property tax exempt status.
Title
Authorizes the Chabad Lubavitch Chai Center, Inc. to receive retroactive real property tax exempt status.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-06-15 | Assembly | substituted by s7910a |
2016-06-14 | Assembly | ordered to third reading rules cal.371 |
2016-06-14 | Assembly | rules report cal.371 |
2016-06-14 | Assembly | reported |
2016-06-14 | Assembly | reported referred to rules |
2016-06-09 | Assembly | reported referred to ways and means |
2016-06-06 | Assembly | print number 10389a |
2016-06-06 | Assembly | amend and recommit to real property taxation |
2016-05-25 | Assembly | referred to real property taxation |
Same As/Similar To
S07910 (Same As) 2016-07-21 - SIGNED CHAP.225