NY A10338 | 2019-2020 | General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on December 31 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-12-31 - APPROVAL MEMO.73
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on December 31 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-12-31 - APPROVAL MEMO.73
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Relates to establishing requirements for the transfer, sale, lease and any decommissioning activities of the Indian Point Nuclear Power Plant; requires employees be paid not less than the prevailing wage in the locality where the Indian Point Nuclear Power Plant is located.
Title
Relates to establishing requirements for the transfer, sale, lease and any decommissioning activities of the Indian Point Nuclear Power Plant; requires employees be paid not less than the prevailing wage in the locality where the Indian Point Nuclear Power Plant is located.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2020-06-10 - Assembly - Assembly Ways And Means Committee: Favorable refer to committee Rules (Y: 24 N: 7 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2020-06-10 - Assembly - Assembly Rules Committee: Favorable (Y: 26 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2020-06-09 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 61 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-03-03 - Senate - Senate Labor Committee Vote (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-06-10 - Assembly - Assembly Rules Committee: Favorable (Y: 26 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2020-06-09 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 61 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-03-03 - Senate - Senate Labor Committee Vote (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-12-31 | Assembly | APPROVAL MEMO.73 |
2020-12-31 | Assembly | SIGNED CHAP.384 |
2020-12-19 | Senate | DELIVERED TO GOVERNOR |
2020-06-10 | Senate | returned to senate |
2020-06-10 | Senate | passed assembly |
2020-06-10 | Senate | ordered to third reading rules cal.140 |
2020-06-10 | Senate | substituted for a10338 |
2020-06-09 | Senate | referred to ways and means |
2020-06-09 | Assembly | DELIVERED TO ASSEMBLY |
2020-06-09 | Assembly | PASSED SENATE |
2020-03-10 | Assembly | ADVANCED TO THIRD READING |
2020-03-04 | Assembly | 2ND REPORT CAL. |
2020-03-03 | Assembly | 1ST REPORT CAL.576 |
2020-02-26 | Assembly | REFERRED TO LABOR |
2020-06-10 | Assembly | substituted by s7846 |
2020-06-10 | Assembly | rules report cal.140 |
2020-06-10 | Assembly | reported |
2020-06-10 | Assembly | reported referred to rules |
2020-06-08 | Assembly | reference changed to ways and means |
2020-06-06 | Assembly | reference changed to codes |
2020-04-29 | Assembly | referred to labor |
Same As/Similar To
S07846 (Same As) 2020-12-31 - APPROVAL MEMO.73