NY A10334 | 2011-2012 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on May 22 2012 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2012-06-21 - substituted by s7674
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on May 22 2012 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2012-06-21 - substituted by s7674
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Designates a bridge on state route 20 in the town of Nassau, county of Rensselaer, as the "Staff Sergeant Derek Farley Memorial Bridge".
Title
Designates a bridge on state route 20 in the town of Nassau, county of Rensselaer, as the "Staff Sergeant Derek Farley Memorial Bridge".
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-06-21 | Assembly | substituted by s7674 |
2012-06-21 | Assembly | rules report cal.567 |
2012-06-21 | Assembly | reported |
2012-06-21 | Assembly | reported referred to rules |
2012-06-20 | Assembly | reported referred to ways and means |
2012-06-11 | Assembly | print number 10334a |
2012-06-11 | Assembly | amend and recommit to transportation |
2012-05-22 | Assembly | referred to transportation |
Same As/Similar To
S07674 (Same As) 2012-07-03 - SIGNED CHAP.100