NY A10300 | 2009-2010 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on March 17 2010 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2010-06-16 - substituted by s7448a
Status: Introduced on March 17 2010 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2010-06-16 - substituted by s7448a
Summary
Relates to exempting qualified religious organizations from fees associated with permits required to display fireworks.
Title
Relates to exempting qualified religious organizations from fees associated with permits required to display fireworks.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-06-16 | substituted by s7448a | |
2010-06-16 | rules report cal.191 | |
2010-06-16 | reported | |
2010-06-08 | reported referred to rules | |
2010-06-02 | print number 10300a | |
2010-06-02 | amend (t) and recommit to codes | |
2010-03-17 | referred to codes |
Same As/Similar To
S07448 (Same As) 2010-10-01 - VETOED MEMO.6826
New York State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://assembly.state.ny.us/leg/?default_fld=&bn=A10300&term=2009&Summary=Y&Actions=Y&Text=Y&Committee%26nbspVotes=Y&Floor%26nbspVotes=Y |