NY A10253 | 2021-2022 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on May 13 2022 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-06-03 - substituted by s9145a
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on May 13 2022 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-06-03 - substituted by s9145a
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Authorizes the town of Brookhaven, county of Suffolk assessor to accept an application for a real property tax exemption from Word of Truth Church, Inc. with respect to the 2021-2022 assessment roll for all of the 2021-2022 school taxes and all of the 2021 and 2022 general taxes.
Title
Authorizes the town of Brookhaven, county of Suffolk assessor to accept an application for a real property tax exemption from Word of Truth Church, Inc. with respect to the 2021-2022 assessment roll for all of the 2021-2022 school taxes and all of the 2021 and 2022 general taxes.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2022-06-03 - Assembly - Assembly Rules Committee: Favorable (Y: 28 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2022-05-31 - Assembly - Assembly Ways And Means Committee: Favorable refer to committee Rules (Y: 34 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2022-05-31 - Assembly - Assembly Ways And Means Committee: Favorable refer to committee Rules (Y: 34 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-06-03 | Assembly | substituted by s9145a |
2022-06-03 | Assembly | rules report cal.744 |
2022-06-03 | Assembly | reported |
2022-05-31 | Assembly | reported referred to rules |
2022-05-27 | Assembly | reference changed to ways and means |
2022-05-26 | Assembly | print number 10253a |
2022-05-26 | Assembly | amend and recommit to real property taxation |
2022-05-13 | Assembly | referred to real property taxation |
Same As/Similar To
S09145 (Same As) 2022-11-22 - SIGNED CHAP.638