NY A10223 | 2015-2016 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Vetoed on November 28 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-11-28 - tabled
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Vetoed on November 28 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-11-28 - tabled
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Reinstates certain entities as empire zone business enterprises that were improperly decertified.
Title
Reinstates certain entities as empire zone business enterprises that were improperly decertified.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-11-28 | Senate | tabled |
2016-11-28 | Senate | vetoed memo.257 |
2016-11-16 | Assembly | delivered to governor |
2016-06-15 | Senate | RETURNED TO ASSEMBLY |
2016-06-15 | Senate | PASSED SENATE |
2016-06-15 | Senate | 3RD READING CAL.1827 |
2016-06-15 | Senate | SUBSTITUTED FOR S7609 |
2016-06-15 | Senate | REFERRED TO RULES |
2016-06-15 | Assembly | delivered to senate |
2016-06-15 | Assembly | passed assembly |
2016-06-14 | Assembly | ordered to third reading rules cal.306 |
2016-06-14 | Assembly | rules report cal.306 |
2016-06-14 | Assembly | reported |
2016-06-07 | Assembly | reported referred to rules |
2016-05-17 | Assembly | referred to ways and means |
Same As/Similar To
S07609 (Same As) 2016-06-15 - SUBSTITUTED BY A10223