NY A10219 | 2021-2022 | General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on June 30 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-06-30 - signed chap.309
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on June 30 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-06-30 - signed chap.309
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Ties the duration a commercial learner's permit issued by the state is valid to the duration of validity in federal law for a commercial learner's permit.
Title
Ties the duration a commercial learner's permit issued by the state is valid to the duration of validity in federal law for a commercial learner's permit.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2022-05-23 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 61 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2022-05-17 - Assembly - Assembly Rules Committee: Favorable (Y: 28 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2022-05-17 - Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 146 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2022-05-11 - Assembly - Assembly Ways And Means Committee: Favorable refer to committee Rules (Y: 35 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-05-10 - Assembly - Assembly Transportation Committee: Favorable refer to committee Ways and Means (Y: 26 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-05-17 - Assembly - Assembly Rules Committee: Favorable (Y: 28 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2022-05-17 - Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 146 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2022-05-11 - Assembly - Assembly Ways And Means Committee: Favorable refer to committee Rules (Y: 35 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-05-10 - Assembly - Assembly Transportation Committee: Favorable refer to committee Ways and Means (Y: 26 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-06-30 | Assembly | signed chap.309 |
2022-06-23 | Assembly | delivered to governor |
2022-05-23 | Senate | RETURNED TO ASSEMBLY |
2022-05-23 | Senate | PASSED SENATE |
2022-05-23 | Senate | 3RD READING CAL.1385 |
2022-05-23 | Senate | SUBSTITUTED FOR S8979A |
2022-05-17 | Senate | REFERRED TO RULES |
2022-05-17 | Assembly | delivered to senate |
2022-05-17 | Assembly | passed assembly |
2022-05-17 | Assembly | ordered to third reading rules cal.274 |
2022-05-17 | Assembly | rules report cal.274 |
2022-05-17 | Assembly | reported |
2022-05-11 | Assembly | reported referred to rules |
2022-05-10 | Assembly | reported referred to ways and means |
2022-05-06 | Assembly | referred to transportation |
Same As/Similar To
S08979 (Same As) 2022-05-23 - SUBSTITUTED BY A10219