NY A10217 | 2011-2012 | General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on July 18 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-07-18 - signed chap.168
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on July 18 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-07-18 - signed chap.168
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Authorizes the town of Clifton Park to discontinue the use of certain park land and lease such land for use as a wireless communications facility.
Title
Authorizes the town of Clifton Park to discontinue the use of certain park land and lease such land for use as a wireless communications facility.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2012-06-20 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 59 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 128 N: 13 NV: 0 Abs: 9) [PASS]
Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 128 N: 13 NV: 0 Abs: 9) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-07-18 | Senate | signed chap.168 |
2012-07-06 | Assembly | delivered to governor |
2012-06-20 | Senate | RETURNED TO ASSEMBLY |
2012-06-20 | Senate | PASSED SENATE |
2012-06-20 | Senate | 3RD READING CAL.1388 |
2012-06-20 | Senate | SUBSTITUTED FOR S7427A |
2012-06-18 | Senate | REFERRED TO RULES |
2012-06-18 | Assembly | delivered to senate |
2012-06-18 | Assembly | passed assembly |
2012-06-18 | Assembly | home rule request |
2012-06-14 | Assembly | ordered to third reading rules cal.245 |
2012-06-14 | Assembly | rules report cal.245 |
2012-06-14 | Assembly | reported |
2012-06-13 | Assembly | reported referred to rules |
2012-06-11 | Assembly | reported referred to ways and means |
2012-05-30 | Assembly | print number 10217a |
2012-05-30 | Assembly | amend and recommit to local governments |
2012-05-15 | Assembly | referred to local governments |
Same As/Similar To
S07427 (Same As) 2012-06-20 - SUBSTITUTED BY A10217A