NY A10177 | 2017-2018 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Introduced on March 22 2018 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-06-11 - reported referred to rules
Pending: Assembly Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on March 22 2018 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-06-11 - reported referred to rules
Pending: Assembly Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Relates to reporting on the status and outcomes of initiatives created in response to the heroin and opioid epidemic.
Title
Relates to reporting on the status and outcomes of initiatives created in response to the heroin and opioid epidemic.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-06-11 - Assembly - Assembly Ways And Means Committee: Favorable refer to committee Rules (Y: 32 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2018-06-05 - Assembly - Assembly Alcoholism And Drug Abuse Committee: Favorable refer to committee Ways and Means (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-06-05 - Assembly - Assembly Alcoholism And Drug Abuse Committee: Favorable refer to committee Ways and Means (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-06-11 | Assembly | reported referred to rules |
2018-06-05 | Assembly | reported referred to ways and means |
2018-05-30 | Assembly | print number 10177a |
2018-05-30 | Assembly | amend (t) and recommit to alcoholism and drug abuse |
2018-03-22 | Assembly | referred to alcoholism and drug abuse |