NY A10133 | 2011-2012 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on June 21 2012 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2012-06-21 - REFERRED TO RULES
Pending: Senate Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on June 21 2012 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2012-06-21 - REFERRED TO RULES
Pending: Senate Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Requires reports by state agencies relating to certain grants and expenditures made to community based organizations; requires listing by zip code of such grants.
Title
Requires reports by state agencies relating to certain grants and expenditures made to community based organizations; requires listing by zip code of such grants.
Sponsors
Asm. Inez Barron [D] |
Roll Calls
Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 123 N: 9 NV: 0 Abs: 18) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-06-21 | Senate | REFERRED TO RULES |
2012-06-21 | Assembly | delivered to senate |
2012-06-21 | Assembly | passed assembly |
2012-06-20 | Assembly | ordered to third reading rules cal.493 |
2012-06-20 | Assembly | rules report cal.493 |
2012-06-20 | Assembly | reported |
2012-06-20 | Assembly | reported referred to rules |
2012-06-18 | Assembly | reported referred to ways and means |
2012-06-14 | Assembly | print number 10133a |
2012-06-14 | Assembly | amend and recommit to governmental operations |
2012-05-09 | Assembly | referred to governmental operations |
Same As/Similar To
S06356 (Same As) 2012-06-21 - COMMITTED TO RULES