NY A10121 | 2019-2020 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 13-2)
Status: Engrossed on June 10 2020 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-06-10 - REFERRED TO RULES
Pending: Senate Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on June 10 2020 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-06-10 - REFERRED TO RULES
Pending: Senate Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Directs the department of health, with the assistance of other state departments and agencies, to conduct a study on the quality of life and human health impacts of John F. Kennedy international airport and LaGuardia airport.
Title
Directs the department of health, with the assistance of other state departments and agencies, to conduct a study on the quality of life and human health impacts of John F. Kennedy international airport and LaGuardia airport.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2020-06-10 - Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 140 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2020-06-09 - Assembly - Assembly Ways And Means Committee: Favorable refer to committee Rules (Y: 30 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2020-06-09 - Assembly - Assembly Rules Committee: Favorable (Y: 26 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2020-06-09 - Assembly - Assembly Ways And Means Committee: Favorable refer to committee Rules (Y: 30 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2020-06-09 - Assembly - Assembly Rules Committee: Favorable (Y: 26 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-06-10 | Senate | REFERRED TO RULES |
2020-06-10 | Assembly | delivered to senate |
2020-06-10 | Assembly | passed assembly |
2020-06-09 | Assembly | ordered to third reading rules cal.116 |
2020-06-09 | Assembly | rules report cal.116 |
2020-06-09 | Assembly | reported |
2020-06-09 | Assembly | reported referred to rules |
2020-06-06 | Assembly | reference changed to ways and means |
2020-03-12 | Assembly | referred to environmental conservation |
Same As/Similar To
S07305 (Same As) 2020-03-12 - PRINT NUMBER 7305A