NY A10120 | 2009-2010 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Engrossed on May 24 2010 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2010-05-24 - REFERRED TO FINANCE
Pending: Senate Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on May 24 2010 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2010-05-24 - REFERRED TO FINANCE
Pending: Senate Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
To extend the temporary commission to promote the 250th anniversary of the French and Indian War.
Title
Extends from December 31, 2010 until December 31, 2014, the expiration of the New York state French and Indian war 250th anniversary commemoration commission.
Sponsors
Asm. Francine DelMonte [D] | Asm. Steven Englebright [D] | Asm. John McEneny [D] | Asm. Addie Jenne [D] |
Asm. Matthew Titone [D] |
Roll Calls
2010-05-24 - Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 137 N: 0 NV: 12 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-05-24 | REFERRED TO FINANCE | |
2010-05-24 | delivered to senate | |
2010-05-24 | passed assembly | |
2010-05-20 | advanced to third reading cal.912 | |
2010-05-17 | reported | |
2010-04-20 | print number 10120a | |
2010-04-20 | amend and recommit to ways and means | |
2010-03-17 | reported referred to ways and means | |
2010-03-05 | referred to tourism, arts and sports development |
Same As/Similar To
S7150 (Same As) 2010-04-29 - PRINT NUMBER 7150A