NY A10080 | 2021-2022 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on April 29 2022 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-05-03 - substituted by s8948
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on April 29 2022 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-05-03 - substituted by s8948
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Provides that for an employer to participate in the New York youth jobs program tax credit program eleven, they must submit their application no later than December 1, 2023; requires that a pass-through entity tax election must be made by September 15, 2022 for the 2022 tax year; provides for necessary estimated payments for electing resident S corporations based on the date a pass-through entity tax election was made.
Title
Provides that for an employer to participate in the New York youth jobs program tax credit program eleven, they must submit their application no later than December 1, 2023; requires that a pass-through entity tax election must be made by September 15, 2022 for the 2022 tax year; provides for necessary estimated payments for electing resident S corporations based on the date a pass-through entity tax election was made.
Sponsors
Asm. Steve Stern [D] |
Roll Calls
2022-05-03 - Assembly - Assembly Ways And Means Committee: Favorable refer to committee Rules (Y: 32 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2022-05-03 - Assembly - Assembly Rules Committee: Favorable (Y: 29 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2022-05-03 - Assembly - Assembly Rules Committee: Favorable (Y: 29 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-05-03 | Assembly | substituted by s8948 |
2022-05-03 | Assembly | rules report cal.96 |
2022-05-03 | Assembly | reported |
2022-05-03 | Assembly | reported referred to rules |
2022-04-29 | Assembly | referred to ways and means |
Same As/Similar To
S08948 (Same As) 2022-05-06 - SIGNED CHAP.188