NY A10036 | 2023-2024 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Engrossed on May 30 2024 - 50% progression
Action: 2024-05-30 - RETURNED TO ASSEMBLY
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on May 30 2024 - 50% progression
Action: 2024-05-30 - RETURNED TO ASSEMBLY
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Creates an "I Love NY Historic Small Business" niche brand to highlight small businesses listed on the registry of historic businesses maintained pursuant to section 14.11 of the parks, recreation and historic preservation law.
Title
Creates an "I Love NY Historic Small Business" niche brand to highlight small businesses listed on the registry of historic businesses maintained pursuant to section 14.11 of the parks, recreation and historic preservation law.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2024-05-30 - Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 144 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2024-05-30 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 57 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2024-05-28 - Assembly - Assembly Rules Committee: Favorable (Y: 28 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2024-05-22 - Assembly - Assembly Ways And Means Committee: Favorable refer to committee Rules (Y: 34 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2024-05-07 - Assembly - Assembly Small Business Committee: Favorable refer to committee Ways and Means (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2024-05-30 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 57 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2024-05-28 - Assembly - Assembly Rules Committee: Favorable (Y: 28 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2024-05-22 - Assembly - Assembly Ways And Means Committee: Favorable refer to committee Rules (Y: 34 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2024-05-07 - Assembly - Assembly Small Business Committee: Favorable refer to committee Ways and Means (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-05-30 | Senate | RETURNED TO ASSEMBLY |
2024-05-30 | Senate | PASSED SENATE |
2024-05-30 | Senate | 3RD READING CAL.1438 |
2024-05-30 | Senate | SUBSTITUTED FOR S9268 |
2024-05-30 | Senate | REFERRED TO COMMERCE, ECONOMIC DEVELOPMENT AND SMALL BUSINESS |
2024-05-30 | Assembly | delivered to senate |
2024-05-30 | Assembly | passed assembly |
2024-05-28 | Assembly | ordered to third reading rules cal.209 |
2024-05-28 | Assembly | rules report cal.209 |
2024-05-28 | Assembly | reported |
2024-05-22 | Assembly | reported referred to rules |
2024-05-07 | Assembly | reported referred to ways and means |
2024-05-02 | Assembly | referred to small business |
Same As/Similar To
S09268 (Same As) 2024-05-30 - SUBSTITUTED BY A10036