NY A10036 | 2015-2016 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on May 6 2016 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-06-15 - substituted by s7429
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on May 6 2016 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-06-15 - substituted by s7429
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Designates a portion of state route 275 in the village of Richburg, county of Allegany, as the "Private First Class Duane C. Scott Memorial Highway".
Title
Designates a portion of state route 275 in the village of Richburg, county of Allegany, as the "Private First Class Duane C. Scott Memorial Highway".
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-06-15 | Assembly | substituted by s7429 |
2016-06-14 | Assembly | ordered to third reading rules cal.301 |
2016-06-14 | Assembly | rules report cal.301 |
2016-06-14 | Assembly | reported |
2016-06-08 | Assembly | reported referred to rules |
2016-06-06 | Assembly | reported referred to ways and means |
2016-05-06 | Assembly | referred to transportation |
Same As/Similar To
S07429 (Same As) 2016-09-29 - SIGNED CHAP.381