NY A09952 | 2013-2014 | General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on July 22 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-07-22 - signed chap.135
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on July 22 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-07-22 - signed chap.135
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Relates to a lump sum payment at retirement; includes sheriffs, deputy sheriffs and correction officers in the group of eligible members who may elect an optional form of retirement which provides for a partial lump sum at retirement with a reduced service retirement allowance.
Title
Relates to a lump sum payment at retirement; includes sheriffs, deputy sheriffs and correction officers in the group of eligible members who may elect an optional form of retirement which provides for a partial lump sum at retirement with a reduced service retirement allowance.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2014-06-19 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 60 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 134 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 134 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-07-22 | Senate | signed chap.135 |
2014-07-11 | Assembly | delivered to governor |
2014-06-19 | Senate | RETURNED TO ASSEMBLY |
2014-06-19 | Senate | PASSED SENATE |
2014-06-19 | Senate | 3RD READING CAL.1648 |
2014-06-19 | Senate | SUBSTITUTED FOR S7756 |
2014-06-19 | Senate | REFERRED TO RULES |
2014-06-19 | Assembly | delivered to senate |
2014-06-19 | Assembly | passed assembly |
2014-06-19 | Assembly | ordered to third reading rules cal.503 |
2014-06-19 | Assembly | rules report cal.503 |
2014-06-18 | Assembly | reported |
2014-06-18 | Assembly | reported referred to rules |
2014-06-12 | Assembly | reported referred to ways and means |
2014-06-03 | Assembly | referred to governmental employees |
Same As/Similar To
S07756 (Same As) 2014-06-19 - SUBSTITUTED BY A9952