NY A09947 | 2009-2010 | General Assembly

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on September 17 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-09-17 - signed chap.497
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Authorizes William Bianco and Eric Lipinsky to file for retroactive membership in the optional 20 year retirement plan of the New York State and Local Retirement System.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Authorizes William Bianco and Eric Lipinsky to file for retroactive membership in the optional 20 year retirement plan of the New York State and Local Retirement System.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2010-06-30 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 61 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-06-15 - Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 139 N: 7 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2010-09-17 signed chap.497
2010-09-07 delivered to governor
2010-06-30 RETURNED TO ASSEMBLY
2010-06-30 PASSED SENATE
2010-06-30 HOME RULE REQUEST
2010-06-30 3RD READING CAL.1334
2010-06-30 SUBSTITUTED FOR S6861
2010-06-15 REFERRED TO RULES
2010-06-15 delivered to senate
2010-06-15 passed assembly
2010-06-15 home rule request
2010-06-15 ordered to third reading rules cal.145
2010-06-15 rules report cal.145
2010-06-15 reported
2010-06-15 reported referred to rules
2010-04-20 reported referred to ways and means
2010-02-17 referred to governmental employees

Same As/Similar To

S06861 (Same As) 2010-06-30 - SUBSTITUTED BY A9947

New York State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback