NY A09909 | 2015-2016 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Engrossed on June 6 2016 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2016-06-06 - REFERRED TO CULTURAL AFFAIRS, TOURISM, PARKS AND RECREATION
Pending: Senate Cultural Affairs, Tourism, Parks and Recreation Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on June 6 2016 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2016-06-06 - REFERRED TO CULTURAL AFFAIRS, TOURISM, PARKS AND RECREATION
Pending: Senate Cultural Affairs, Tourism, Parks and Recreation Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Extends effectiveness of provisions relating to establishing a pilot grant program to help working artists secure shared use facilities until 2020.
Title
Extends effectiveness of provisions relating to establishing a pilot grant program to help working artists secure shared use facilities until 2020.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-06-06 | Senate | REFERRED TO CULTURAL AFFAIRS, TOURISM, PARKS AND RECREATION |
2016-06-06 | Assembly | delivered to senate |
2016-06-06 | Assembly | passed assembly |
2016-05-26 | Assembly | advanced to third reading cal.845 |
2016-05-24 | Assembly | reported |
2016-05-05 | Assembly | reported referred to ways and means |
2016-04-26 | Assembly | referred to tourism, parks, arts and sports development |