NY A09895 | 2011-2012 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 28-0)
Status: Engrossed on June 19 2012 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2012-06-19 - REFERRED TO RULES
Pending: Senate Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on June 19 2012 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2012-06-19 - REFERRED TO RULES
Pending: Senate Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Relates to transportable classroom units.
Title
Relates to transportable classroom units.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 109 N: 33 NV: 0 Abs: 8) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-06-19 | Senate | REFERRED TO RULES |
2012-06-19 | Assembly | delivered to senate |
2012-06-19 | Assembly | passed assembly |
2012-06-14 | Assembly | ordered to third reading rules cal.220 |
2012-06-14 | Assembly | rules report cal.220 |
2012-06-14 | Assembly | reported |
2012-06-06 | Assembly | reported referred to rules |
2012-05-09 | Assembly | reported referred to ways and means |
2012-04-20 | Assembly | referred to education |