NY A09889 | 2011-2012 | General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on August 17 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-08-17 - signed chap.391
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on August 17 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-08-17 - signed chap.391
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Makes permanent provisions of the retirement and social security law that permit certain members of public retirement systems to receive partial lump sum distributions upon retirement.
Title
Makes permanent provisions of the retirement and social security law that permit certain members of public retirement systems to receive partial lump sum distributions upon retirement.
Sponsors
Asm. Peter Abbate [D] | Asm. Nick Perry [D] |
Roll Calls
2012-06-21 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 60 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 141 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 9) [PASS]
Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 141 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 9) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-08-17 | Senate | signed chap.391 |
2012-08-06 | Assembly | delivered to governor |
2012-06-21 | Senate | RETURNED TO ASSEMBLY |
2012-06-21 | Senate | PASSED SENATE |
2012-06-21 | Senate | 3RD READING CAL.1475 |
2012-06-21 | Senate | SUBSTITUTED FOR S7074A |
2012-06-20 | Senate | REFERRED TO RULES |
2012-06-20 | Assembly | delivered to senate |
2012-06-20 | Assembly | passed assembly |
2012-06-20 | Assembly | ordered to third reading rules cal.520 |
2012-06-20 | Assembly | rules report cal.520 |
2012-06-20 | Assembly | reported |
2012-06-14 | Assembly | reported referred to rules |
2012-06-05 | Assembly | reported referred to ways and means |
2012-05-14 | Assembly | print number 9889a |
2012-05-14 | Assembly | amend and recommit to governmental employees |
2012-04-20 | Assembly | referred to governmental employees |
Same As/Similar To
S07074 (Same As) 2012-06-21 - SUBSTITUTED BY A9889A