NY A09874 | 2019-2020 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 82-11)
Status: Engrossed on July 21 2020 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-07-21 - REFERRED TO RULES
Pending: Senate Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on July 21 2020 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-07-21 - REFERRED TO RULES
Pending: Senate Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Relates to a state transportation plan; requires such plan include a minimum twenty-year forecast period at the time of adoption, assessing long-range needs spanning such period, including a forecast of highway pavement and bridge conditions; and requires the commissioner of transportation to submit a report to the governor, the temporary president of the senate, and the speaker of the assembly, beginning September first, two thousand nineteen and semi-annually thereafter, a list of those capital projects in the department's capital program that have experienced major schedule changes or major cost changes in letting schedule or construction cost.
Title
Relates to a state transportation plan; requires such plan include a minimum twenty-year forecast period at the time of adoption, assessing long-range needs spanning such period, including a forecast of highway pavement and bridge conditions; and requires the commissioner of transportation to submit a report to the governor, the temporary president of the senate, and the speaker of the assembly, beginning September first, two thousand nineteen and semi-annually thereafter, a list of those capital projects in the department's capital program that have experienced major schedule changes or major cost changes in letting schedule or construction cost.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2020-07-21 - Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 142 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2020-07-20 - Assembly - Assembly Rules Committee: Favorable (Y: 27 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2020-07-17 - Assembly - Assembly Ways And Means Committee: Favorable refer to committee Rules (Y: 32 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2020-03-10 - Assembly - Assembly Transportation Committee: Favorable refer to committee Ways and Means (Y: 24 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-07-20 - Assembly - Assembly Rules Committee: Favorable (Y: 27 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2020-07-17 - Assembly - Assembly Ways And Means Committee: Favorable refer to committee Rules (Y: 32 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2020-03-10 - Assembly - Assembly Transportation Committee: Favorable refer to committee Ways and Means (Y: 24 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-07-21 | Senate | REFERRED TO RULES |
2020-07-21 | Assembly | delivered to senate |
2020-07-21 | Assembly | passed assembly |
2020-07-20 | Assembly | ordered to third reading rules cal.193 |
2020-07-20 | Assembly | rules report cal.193 |
2020-07-20 | Assembly | reported |
2020-07-17 | Assembly | reported referred to rules |
2020-03-10 | Assembly | reported referred to ways and means |
2020-02-20 | Assembly | referred to transportation |
Same As/Similar To
S07779 (Same As) 2020-02-19 - REFERRED TO TRANSPORTATION