NY A09855 | 2011-2012 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 29-17)
Status: Engrossed on May 23 2012 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2012-05-23 - REFERRED TO HEALTH
Pending: Senate Health Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on May 23 2012 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2012-05-23 - REFERRED TO HEALTH
Pending: Senate Health Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Adds synthetic cannabinoids to the schedule of controlled substances.
Title
Adds synthetic cannabinoids to the schedule of controlled substances.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 128 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 20) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-05-23 | Senate | REFERRED TO HEALTH |
2012-05-23 | Assembly | delivered to senate |
2012-05-23 | Assembly | passed assembly |
2012-05-22 | Assembly | ordered to third reading rules cal.35 |
2012-05-22 | Assembly | rules report cal.35 |
2012-05-22 | Assembly | reported |
2012-05-22 | Assembly | reported referred to rules |
2012-05-22 | Assembly | reported referred to codes |
2012-05-03 | Assembly | print number 9855a |
2012-05-03 | Assembly | amend (t) and recommit to health |
2012-04-18 | Assembly | referred to health |