NY A09847 | 2013-2014 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Vetoed on November 21 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-11-21 - tabled
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Vetoed on November 21 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-11-21 - tabled
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Creates the Starr public library district and provides for the means for construction and financing of facilities for the district.
Title
Creates the Starr public library district and provides for the means for construction and financing of facilities for the district.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 135 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-11-21 | Senate | tabled |
2014-11-21 | Senate | vetoed memo.509 |
2014-11-10 | Assembly | delivered to governor |
2014-06-20 | Senate | RETURNED TO ASSEMBLY |
2014-06-20 | Senate | PASSED SENATE |
2014-06-20 | Senate | 3RD READING CAL.1709 |
2014-06-20 | Senate | SUBSTITUTED FOR S7259A |
2014-06-16 | Senate | REFERRED TO RULES |
2014-06-16 | Assembly | delivered to senate |
2014-06-16 | Assembly | passed assembly |
2014-06-11 | Assembly | ordered to third reading rules cal.224 |
2014-06-11 | Assembly | rules report cal.224 |
2014-06-11 | Assembly | reported |
2014-06-09 | Assembly | reported referred to rules |
2014-06-03 | Assembly | reported referred to ways and means |
2014-05-30 | Assembly | print number 9847a |
2014-05-30 | Assembly | amend and recommit to libraries and education technology |
2014-05-27 | Assembly | referred to libraries and education technology |
Same As/Similar To
S07259 (Same As) 2014-06-20 - SUBSTITUTED BY A9847A