NY A09834 | 2015-2016 | General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on November 28 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-11-28 - signed chap.461
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on November 28 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-11-28 - signed chap.461
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Allows certain social service or health personnel to disclose confidential HIV related information for research purposes.
Title
Allows certain social service or health personnel to disclose confidential HIV related information for research purposes.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-11-28 | Senate | signed chap.461 |
2016-11-16 | Assembly | delivered to governor |
2016-06-16 | Senate | RETURNED TO ASSEMBLY |
2016-06-16 | Senate | PASSED SENATE |
2016-06-16 | Senate | 3RD READING CAL.1940 |
2016-06-16 | Senate | SUBSTITUTED FOR S7505 |
2016-06-16 | Senate | REFERRED TO RULES |
2016-06-16 | Assembly | delivered to senate |
2016-06-16 | Assembly | passed assembly |
2016-06-15 | Assembly | ordered to third reading rules cal.432 |
2016-06-15 | Assembly | rules report cal.432 |
2016-06-15 | Assembly | reported |
2016-06-06 | Assembly | reported referred to rules |
2016-05-04 | Assembly | reported referred to codes |
2016-04-12 | Assembly | referred to health |
Same As/Similar To
S07505 (Same As) 2016-06-16 - SUBSTITUTED BY A9834