NY A09832 | 2011-2012 | General Assembly

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Passed on August 17 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-08-17 - signed chap.389
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Makes permanent certain provisions relating to contracts for public work and building service work.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Makes permanent certain provisions relating to contracts for public work and building service work.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2012-06-20 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 59 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 96 N: 45 NV: 0 Abs: 9) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2012-08-17Senatesigned chap.389
2012-08-06Assemblydelivered to governor
2012-06-20SenateRETURNED TO ASSEMBLY
2012-06-20SenatePASSED SENATE
2012-06-20Senate3RD READING CAL.1076
2012-06-20SenateSUBSTITUTED FOR S6923A
2012-06-12SenateREFERRED TO RULES
2012-06-12Assemblydelivered to senate
2012-06-12Assemblypassed assembly
2012-04-26Assemblyadvanced to third reading cal.497
2012-04-26Assemblyreported
2012-04-17Assemblyreferred to labor

Same As/Similar To

S06923 (Same As) 2012-06-20 - SUBSTITUTED BY A9832

New York State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback