NY A09816 | 2011-2012 | General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on July 18 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-07-18 - signed chap.154
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on July 18 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-07-18 - signed chap.154
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Extends the authority for villages to hold tax lien sales.
Title
Extends the authority for villages to hold tax lien sales.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2012-06-06 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 57 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 133 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 13) [PASS]
Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 133 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 13) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-07-18 | Senate | signed chap.154 |
2012-07-06 | Assembly | delivered to governor |
2012-06-06 | Senate | RETURNED TO ASSEMBLY |
2012-06-06 | Senate | PASSED SENATE |
2012-06-06 | Senate | 3RD READING CAL.697 |
2012-06-06 | Senate | SUBSTITUTED FOR S6929 |
2012-05-21 | Senate | REFERRED TO LOCAL GOVERNMENT |
2012-05-21 | Assembly | delivered to senate |
2012-05-21 | Assembly | passed assembly |
2012-05-17 | Assembly | advanced to third reading cal.603 |
2012-05-15 | Assembly | reported |
2012-05-08 | Assembly | reported referred to ways and means |
2012-04-13 | Assembly | referred to real property taxation |
Same As/Similar To
S06929 (Same As) 2012-06-06 - SUBSTITUTED BY A9816