NY A09813 | 2011-2012 | General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on July 18 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-07-18 - signed chap.153
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on July 18 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-07-18 - signed chap.153
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Extends the effectiveness of provisions relating to establishment of certain water charges for hospitals and charities in New York City for two additional years.
Title
Extends the effectiveness of provisions relating to establishment of certain water charges for hospitals and charities in New York City for two additional years.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2012-06-19 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 59 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 137 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 13) [PASS]
Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 137 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 13) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-07-18 | Senate | signed chap.153 |
2012-07-06 | Assembly | delivered to governor |
2012-06-19 | Senate | RETURNED TO ASSEMBLY |
2012-06-19 | Senate | PASSED SENATE |
2012-06-19 | Senate | 3RD READING CAL.1323 |
2012-06-19 | Senate | SUBSTITUTED FOR S7613 |
2012-05-30 | Senate | REFERRED TO CITIES |
2012-05-30 | Assembly | delivered to senate |
2012-05-30 | Assembly | passed assembly |
2012-05-24 | Assembly | advanced to third reading cal.665 |
2012-05-22 | Assembly | reported |
2012-05-15 | Assembly | reported referred to ways and means |
2012-04-11 | Assembly | referred to cities |
Same As/Similar To
S07613 (Same As) 2012-06-19 - SUBSTITUTED BY A9813