NY A09722 | 2021-2022 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Introduced on March 28 2022 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-05-16 - substituted by s8618
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on March 28 2022 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-05-16 - substituted by s8618
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Requires the commissioner of health by regulation or emergency regulation, to reclassify any compound, mixture or preparation containing any substance listed in Schedule I of section three thousand three hundred six of the public health law as a Schedule II, III, IV or V substance, or exempt it, if that same compound, mixture or preparation is redesignated or rescheduled other than under Schedule I under the federal Controlled Substances Act, or deleted as a controlled substance under the federal Controlled Substances Act.
Title
Requires the commissioner of health by regulation or emergency regulation, to reclassify any compound, mixture or preparation containing any substance listed in Schedule I of section three thousand three hundred six of the public health law as a Schedule II, III, IV or V substance, or exempt it, if that same compound, mixture or preparation is redesignated or rescheduled other than under Schedule I under the federal Controlled Substances Act, or deleted as a controlled substance under the federal Controlled Substances Act.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2022-05-10 - Assembly - Assembly Codes Committee: Favorable refer to committee Rules (Y: 21 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-05-03 - Assembly - Assembly Health Committee: Favorable refer to committee Codes (Y: 25 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2022-05-03 - Assembly - Assembly Health Committee: Favorable refer to committee Codes (Y: 24 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2022-05-03 - Assembly - Assembly Health Committee: Favorable refer to committee Codes (Y: 25 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2022-05-03 - Assembly - Assembly Health Committee: Favorable refer to committee Codes (Y: 24 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-05-16 | Assembly | substituted by s8618 |
2022-05-16 | Assembly | rules report cal.239 |
2022-05-16 | Assembly | reported |
2022-05-10 | Assembly | reported referred to rules |
2022-05-03 | Assembly | reported referred to codes |
2022-03-28 | Assembly | referred to health |
Same As/Similar To
S08618 (Same As) 2022-12-23 - SIGNED CHAP.777