NY A09721 | 2013-2014 | General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Vetoed on December 17 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-12-17 - tabled
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]

Summary

Authorizes the care and treatment of injured employees by licensed or certified acupuncturists under the workers' compensation program.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Authorizes the care and treatment of injured employees by licensed or certified acupuncturists under the workers' compensation program.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 122 N: 13 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2014-12-17Senatetabled
2014-12-17Senatevetoed memo.553
2014-12-05Assemblydelivered to governor
2014-06-20SenateRETURNED TO ASSEMBLY
2014-06-20SenatePASSED SENATE
2014-06-20Senate3RD READING CAL.1698
2014-06-20SenateSUBSTITUTED FOR S7634B
2014-06-19SenateREFERRED TO RULES
2014-06-19Assemblydelivered to senate
2014-06-19Assemblypassed assembly
2014-06-16Assemblyamended on third reading 9721b
2014-06-11Assemblyordered to third reading rules cal.216
2014-06-11Assemblyrules report cal.216
2014-06-11Assemblyreported
2014-06-09Assemblyreported referred to rules
2014-06-03Assemblyprint number 9721a
2014-06-03Assemblyamend and recommit to ways and means
2014-06-03Assemblyreported referred to ways and means
2014-05-27Assemblyreported referred to codes
2014-05-20Assemblyreferred to labor

Same As/Similar To

S07634 (Same As) 2014-06-20 - SUBSTITUTED BY A9721B

New York State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback