NY A09704 | 2021-2022 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on March 28 2022 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-06-02 - substituted by s8482
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on March 28 2022 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-06-02 - substituted by s8482
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Relates to including the village of Owego in the definition of municipality that can apply to the public service commission to order costs for infrastructure maintenance and access to be charged to all customer classes located in such municipality.
Title
Relates to including the village of Owego in the definition of municipality that can apply to the public service commission to order costs for infrastructure maintenance and access to be charged to all customer classes located in such municipality.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2022-06-02 - Assembly - Assembly Rules Committee: Favorable (Y: 27 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2022-05-31 - Assembly - Assembly Ways And Means Committee: Favorable refer to committee Rules (Y: 34 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2022-05-31 - Assembly - Assembly Ways And Means Committee: Favorable refer to committee Rules (Y: 34 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-06-02 | Assembly | substituted by s8482 |
2022-06-02 | Assembly | rules report cal.625 |
2022-06-02 | Assembly | reported |
2022-05-31 | Assembly | reported referred to rules |
2022-05-25 | Assembly | reference changed to ways and means |
2022-03-28 | Assembly | referred to corporations, authorities and commissions |
Same As/Similar To
S08482 (Same As) 2022-12-16 - SIGNED CHAP.715