NY A09678 | 2019-2020 | General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 21-0)
Status: Introduced on February 4 2020 - 25% progression
Action: 2020-03-05 - advanced to third reading cal.468
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Prohibits horizontal drilling and high-volume hydraulic fracturing.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Prohibits horizontal drilling and high-volume hydraulic fracturing.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2020-03-03 - Assembly - Assembly Codes Committee: Favorable (Y: 15 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2020-02-25 - Assembly - Assembly Environmental Conservation Committee: Favorable refer to committee Codes (Y: 20 N: 7 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2020-03-05Assemblyadvanced to third reading cal.468
2020-03-03Assemblyreported
2020-02-25Assemblyreported referred to codes
2020-02-04Assemblyreferred to environmental conservation

Same As/Similar To

S06906 (Same As) 2020-02-10 - ADVANCED TO THIRD READING

New York State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback