NY A09607 | 2017-2018 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 23-0)
Status: Engrossed on June 6 2018 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-06-06 - REFERRED TO RULES
Pending: Senate Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on June 6 2018 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-06-06 - REFERRED TO RULES
Pending: Senate Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Enacts the voter friendly ballot act; relates to the form of the ballot for elections; removes additional provisions for primary elections for New York city.
Title
Enacts the voter friendly ballot act; relates to the form of the ballot for elections; removes additional provisions for primary elections for New York city.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-06-06 - Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 136 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 9) [PASS]
2018-02-05 - Assembly - Assembly Election Law Committee: Favorable (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2018-02-05 - Assembly - Assembly Election Law Committee: Favorable (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-06-06 | Senate | REFERRED TO RULES |
2018-06-06 | Assembly | delivered to senate |
2018-06-06 | Assembly | passed assembly |
2018-02-08 | Assembly | advanced to third reading cal.670 |
2018-02-05 | Assembly | reported |
2018-01-26 | Assembly | referred to election law |
Same As/Similar To
S07538 (Same As) 2018-05-03 - PRINT NUMBER 7538A