NY A09569 | 2011-2012 | General Assembly

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on December 17 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-12-17 - signed chap.494
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]

Summary

Creates the four Orangetown public library districts; modifies the boundaries; authorizes individual libraries to apply for appropriations on an individual basis.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Creates the four Orangetown public library districts; modifies the boundaries; authorizes individual libraries to apply for appropriations on an individual basis.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2012-06-19 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 58 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 133 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 17) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2012-12-17Senatesigned chap.494
2012-12-05Assemblydelivered to governor
2012-06-19SenateRETURNED TO ASSEMBLY
2012-06-19SenatePASSED SENATE
2012-06-19Senate3RD READING CAL.1307
2012-06-19SenateSUBSTITUTED FOR S6751A
2012-06-14SenateREFERRED TO RULES
2012-06-14Assemblydelivered to senate
2012-06-14Assemblypassed assembly
2012-06-11Assemblyordered to third reading rules cal.116
2012-06-11Assemblyrules report cal.116
2012-06-11Assemblyreported
2012-06-06Assemblyreported referred to rules
2012-06-01Assemblyprint number 9569a
2012-06-01Assemblyamend (t) and recommit to ways and means
2012-05-31Assemblyreported referred to ways and means
2012-03-16Assemblyreferred to libraries and education technology

Same As/Similar To

S06751 (Same As) 2012-06-19 - SUBSTITUTED BY A9569A

New York State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback