NY A09566 | 2011-2012 | General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on July 18 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-07-18 - signed chap.145
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on July 18 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-07-18 - signed chap.145
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Authorizes the reopening of the twenty-five year retirement benefit plan to certain deputy sheriffs of Sullivan county who failed to make a timely election thereof.
Title
Authorizes the reopening of the twenty-five year retirement benefit plan to certain deputy sheriffs of Sullivan county who failed to make a timely election thereof.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2012-06-21 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 60 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 140 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 8) [PASS]
Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 140 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 8) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-07-18 | Senate | signed chap.145 |
2012-07-06 | Assembly | delivered to governor |
2012-06-21 | Senate | RETURNED TO ASSEMBLY |
2012-06-21 | Senate | PASSED SENATE |
2012-06-21 | Senate | HOME RULE REQUEST |
2012-06-21 | Senate | 3RD READING CAL.1007 |
2012-06-21 | Senate | SUBSTITUTED FOR S6780 |
2012-06-04 | Senate | REFERRED TO CIVIL SERVICE AND PENSIONS |
2012-06-04 | Assembly | delivered to senate |
2012-06-04 | Assembly | passed assembly |
2012-06-04 | Assembly | home rule request |
2012-06-01 | Assembly | advanced to third reading cal.705 |
2012-05-31 | Assembly | reported |
2012-05-15 | Assembly | reported referred to ways and means |
2012-03-16 | Assembly | referred to governmental employees |
Same As/Similar To
S06780 (Same As) 2012-06-21 - SUBSTITUTED BY A9566