NY A09534 | 2021-2022 | General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 24-6)
Status: Passed on August 17 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-08-17 - signed chap.519
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 24-6)
Status: Passed on August 17 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-08-17 - signed chap.519
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Allows coaches who cannot be certified in CPR to be able to coach high school sports if there is another coach or staff present at the sporting activity who is certified in CPR.
Title
Allows coaches who cannot be certified in CPR to be able to coach high school sports if there is another coach or staff present at the sporting activity who is certified in CPR.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2022-05-18 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 61 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2022-05-03 - Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 147 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2022-04-27 - Assembly - Assembly Education Committee: Favorable (Y: 30 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2022-05-03 - Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 147 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2022-04-27 - Assembly - Assembly Education Committee: Favorable (Y: 30 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-08-17 | Assembly | signed chap.519 |
2022-08-05 | Assembly | delivered to governor |
2022-05-18 | Senate | RETURNED TO ASSEMBLY |
2022-05-18 | Senate | PASSED SENATE |
2022-05-18 | Senate | 3RD READING CAL.1170 |
2022-05-18 | Senate | SUBSTITUTED FOR S8615A |
2022-05-03 | Senate | REFERRED TO EDUCATION |
2022-05-03 | Assembly | delivered to senate |
2022-05-03 | Assembly | passed assembly |
2022-04-28 | Assembly | advanced to third reading cal.568 |
2022-04-27 | Assembly | reported |
2022-04-18 | Assembly | print number 9534a |
2022-04-18 | Assembly | amend and recommit to education |
2022-03-16 | Assembly | referred to education |
Same As/Similar To
S08615 (Same As) 2022-05-18 - SUBSTITUTED BY A9534A