NY A09521 | 2023-2024 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 7-3)
Status: Introduced on March 20 2024 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2024-06-05 - reported referred to rules
Pending: Assembly Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on March 20 2024 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2024-06-05 - reported referred to rules
Pending: Assembly Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Increases the dollar value of abandoned vehicles which may be seized by a local authority.
Title
Increases the dollar value of abandoned vehicles which may be seized by a local authority.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2024-06-05 - Assembly - Assembly Codes Committee: Favorable refer to committee Rules (Y: 20 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2024-05-21 - Assembly - Assembly Transportation Committee: Favorable refer to committee Codes (Y: 23 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2024-05-21 - Assembly - Assembly Transportation Committee: Favorable refer to committee Codes (Y: 23 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-06-05 | Assembly | reported referred to rules |
2024-05-21 | Assembly | reported referred to codes |
2024-05-08 | Assembly | print number 9521a |
2024-05-08 | Assembly | amend and recommit to transportation |
2024-03-20 | Assembly | referred to transportation |
Same As/Similar To
S08726 (Same As) 2024-06-05 - referred to codes