NY A09517 | 2013-2014 | General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on August 11 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-08-11 - signed chap.276
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on August 11 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-08-11 - signed chap.276
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Allows individuals employed at National Cancer Institute designated cancer centers who meet the requirements for a restricted license to receive a certification allowing them to use mass spectrometry, and any tests or procedures acceptable to the commissioner of health in the field of proteomics.
Title
Allows individuals employed at National Cancer Institute designated cancer centers who meet the requirements for a restricted license to receive a certification allowing them to use mass spectrometry, and any tests or procedures acceptable to the commissioner of health in the field of proteomics.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 136 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-08-11 | Senate | signed chap.276 |
2014-08-01 | Assembly | delivered to governor |
2014-06-12 | Senate | RETURNED TO ASSEMBLY |
2014-06-12 | Senate | PASSED SENATE |
2014-06-12 | Senate | 3RD READING CAL.1352 |
2014-06-12 | Senate | SUBSTITUTED FOR S7199A |
2014-06-12 | Senate | REFERRED TO RULES |
2014-06-12 | Assembly | delivered to senate |
2014-06-12 | Assembly | passed assembly |
2014-06-11 | Assembly | ordered to third reading rules cal.201 |
2014-06-11 | Assembly | rules report cal.201 |
2014-06-11 | Assembly | reported |
2014-06-09 | Assembly | reported referred to rules |
2014-06-03 | Assembly | reported referred to codes |
2014-05-29 | Assembly | print number 9517a |
2014-05-29 | Assembly | amend and recommit to higher education |
2014-05-06 | Assembly | referred to higher education |
Same As/Similar To
S07199 (Same As) 2014-06-12 - SUBSTITUTED BY A9517A