NY A09464 | 2009-2010 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 16-0)
Status: Introduced on January 6 2010 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2010-06-16 - held for consideration in codes
Pending: Assembly Codes Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 6 2010 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2010-06-16 - held for consideration in codes
Pending: Assembly Codes Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
To require temperature testing of play- ground equipment, including safety surfaces, constructed, installed, or maintained by any municipality.
Title
Rel S399-dd to be S399-ff, amd S399-ff, Gen Bus L Authorizes the enactment of local laws regarding playground equipment and requires the use of a temperature test on playground equipment installed by municipalities.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-06-16 | held for consideration in codes | |
2010-06-09 | print number 9464c | |
2010-06-09 | amend and recommit to codes | |
2010-06-03 | defeated in codes | |
2010-05-25 | reported referred to codes | |
2010-05-12 | print number 9464b | |
2010-05-12 | amend (t) and recommit to consumer affairs and protection | |
2010-04-21 | print number 9464a | |
2010-04-21 | amend and recommit to consumer affairs and protection | |
2010-01-06 | referred to consumer affairs and protection |
Same As/Similar To
S07471 (Same As) 2010-06-16 - AMENDED ON THIRD READING 7471C